skip to content

Abdin, Rawand Mowaffaq

CPSO#: 105756

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3737 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohammad Qadura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Qadura ( CPSO# 95508 )
Dr. R. Abdin ( CPSO# 105756)

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Suite 7-074 Bond Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jan 2021 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Jul 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAWAND MOWAFFAQ ABDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
AVP - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 29 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Dec 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 29 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Dec 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 29 Dec 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Nov 2020 to 29 Dec 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Dec 2020 to 30 Jan 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2021