skip to content

Qureshy, Bushra

CPSO#: 28561

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 8-Apr-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Albany Medical Clinic, 807 Broadview Avenue, Toronto, ON, M4K 2P8
Date Received: 23 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Qureshy voluntarily resigned from the College, effective May 31, 2016, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.