Qureshi, Shahab (CPSO#: 99226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Aug 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, German, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Universita Palackeho, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahab Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi ( CPSO# 99226 )

Business Address:
720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5C 3G1
Phone Number: (905) 848-8686

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Aug 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Shahab Qureshi may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.