skip to content

Qureshi, Sameer

CPSO#: 85814

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 11 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 23 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2008 to 23 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2009 to 19 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2010