skip to content

Qureshi, Omar

CPSO#: 94409

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 721-3490
Fax: (905) 721-6699 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Qureshi ( CPSO# 94409 )

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 0C7
Phone Number: 9057213490


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012 Active
             Dr. Omar Qureshi may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine, only.