skip to content

Qureshi, Mosarrat Jabin

CPSO#: 92585

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Rajshahi Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 853-2217 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

DTC 5027
10240 Kingsway Ave NW
DTC 5027
Edmonton AB  T5H 3V9
Canada
Phone: (780) 735-4644
Fax: (780) 735-4072
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mosarrat Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Qureshi ( CPSO# 92585 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Qureshi at: Northern Alberta Neonatal Program Royal Alexandra Hospital Site Dtc 5027 10240 Kingsway Edmonton, Alberta T5H 3V9 Tel: (780) 735-4670 Fax: (780) 735-4072
Date Received: 08 Dec 2011


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOSARRAT JABIN QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011