skip to content

Qureshi, Adnan

CPSO#: 95637

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
83 Dawson Road
Suite 212
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: 226-589-8008
Fax: 226-318-0800 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: 519-744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G1G3
Canada
Phone: 519-749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: 519-822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adnan Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 95637 )

Business Address:
202-83 Dawson Rd
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: 226-589-8008

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 749-4300

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Waterloo ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Waterloo ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9W 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Waterloo ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:31 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADNAN QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
AVP - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2018