skip to content

Quon, Michael Joseph

CPSO#: 105189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613)798-5555 Ext. 75354
Fax: 6137378688 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital - General Campu
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 6137378899 Ext. 75354
Fax: 6137378688
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Cam
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paraskevopoulos & Quon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Quon ( CPSO# 105189)
Dr. E. Paraskevopoulos ( CPSO# 117608)

Business Address:
Queensway Carelton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Canada

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH QUON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
EL - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
EL - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2017