skip to content

Quirion, Christine

CPSO#: 97975

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: 705-267-2131 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Quirion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Quirion ( CPSO# 97975 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
38 Pine Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6

Business Address:
681 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins ON  P4N 8S6

Business Address:
Timmins District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
4715 Highway 101 East
PO Box 3211
South Porcupine ON  P0N 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 235-3211

Business Address:
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE QUIRION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2015