skip to content

Quinn, Leo Peter

CPSO#: 21368

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jun 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2012
Corporation Name: Leo Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Glazier Medical Centre 11 Gib St Oshawa, ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 03 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2018