skip to content

Quinn, Joan Margaret

CPSO#: 96686

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
330 Keele St
Toronto ON  M6P2K7
Phone: 905 572-2685 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

6020 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M2M3V9
Canada
Phone: 416 661-6174
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2065 Finch Ave. W
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Canada
Phone: 416 519-6464
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

9140 Leslie St
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0A9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Correctional Services, Mental Healt
330 Keele St, Main Floor
Toronto ON  M6P 2K7
Canada
Phone: 416 762-3781
Fax: 416 973-9723
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1401-123 Edward St
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416 546-0675
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:04 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 08 Apr 2021 Active
 
As from April 2, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joan Margaret Quinn  in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Quinn to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking") of
DR. JOAN MARGARET QUINN
("Dr. Quinn") to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Quinn, certificate of registration number 96686, am a member of the College.

(3)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1108463 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my psychiatry practice.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Clinical Supervision

(a)	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for a minimum of six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision").
 
b)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

i.	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B";

ii.	Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;

iii.	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for a minimum of three (3) months;

iv.	After a minimum of three (3) months of Clinical Supervision, if my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month for a further three (3) months;

v.	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;

vi.	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

vii.	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;

viii.	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

ix.	Submit written reports to the College at least once every month for three (3) months or until the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, and then once at the end of supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

c)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated October 19, 2020 and January 19, 2021, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

d)	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
 
e)	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

f)	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

g)	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

h)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

6)	Professional Education

a.	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

i.	Master Psychopharmacology Program, Neuroscience Education Institute www.neiglobal.com/Members/MPP/MPPOverview/tabid/307/Default.aspx

ii.	EK Koranyi Review Course in Psychiatry, University of Ottawa https://med.uottawa.ca/professional-development/

iii.	Medical Record-Keeping Course, University of Toronto: www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/

iv.	Workshop: Test Results Follow-up, CMPA: www.cmpa- acpm.ca/en/education-events/workshops/workshop-test-results-follow-up

v.	Review, reflection, and discussion with Clinical Supervisor of the following policies and other self-study:

1.	Consent to Treatment, CPSO:	www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies- Guidance/Policies/Consent-to-Treatment

2.	A Practical Guide to Mental Health and the Law in Ontario Revised Edition,	September	2016,	Ontario	Hospital	Association: www.oha.com/Legislative%20and%20Legal%20Issues%20Documents1/ OHA_Mental%20Health%20and%20the%20Law%20Toolkit%20-
%20Revised%20(2016).pdf
 
3.	Boundary Violations, CPSO:	www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies- Guidance/Policies/Boundary-Violations

4.	Medical Records Documentation, CPSO: www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Medical- Records-Documentation

5.	Medical Records Management, CPSO: www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Medical- Records-Management

6.	Managing Tests, CPSO: www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-
Guidance/Policies/Managing-Tests

vi.	individualized instruction in communication satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College;

vii.	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

b.	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

c.	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake to complete this requirement by within six months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

d.	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

e.	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

7)	Reassessment of Practice

a.	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (6) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors"). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
 
b.	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

c.	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.

d.	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

8)	Monitoring

a.	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

b.	I, Dr. Quinn, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

c.	I, Dr. Quinn, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

d.	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D", respectively.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

9)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

10)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

11)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
 
12)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

13)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

14)	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

15)	Public Register

a.	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

b.	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Quinn engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her psychiatry practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Quinn will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months.

Dr. Quinn will engage in professional education in Psychopharmacology, Psychiatry, Communication and Test Results Follow-up.

Dr. Quinn's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within approximately three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

c.	I, Dr. Quinn, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

16)	I, Dr. Quinn, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

a.	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
 
b.	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

c.	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


17)	I, Dr. Quinn, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

18)	I, Dr. Quinn, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

a.	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

b.	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;

c.	any information relevant to the Reassessment;

d.	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

e.	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.





Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 2, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joan Margaret Quinn to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 2, 2021:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Quinn engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her psychiatry practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Quinn will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months.

Dr. Quinn will engage in professional education in Psychopharmacology, Psychiatry, Communication and Test Results Follow-up.

Dr. Quinn’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within approximately three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.