skip to content

Quinlan, Christina Wendy

CPSO#: 91602

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Family Health Team
Suite 105
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: 613-549-0464
Fax: 613 549-0490 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christina Quinlan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Quinlan ( CPSO# 91602 )

Business Address:
200 - 2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Business Address:
Kingston Family Health Team
797 Princess Street
Suite 105
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 549-0464

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA WENDY QUINLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 02 Aug 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2012