skip to content

Quevillon, Joseph Albert Jean

CPSO#: 28901

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Quevillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 1B 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa ON K1G 0Y9 Website: http://www.accuro.ca Telephone: (613) - 738-1242 Fax: (613) - 738-0562
Date Received: 18 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015