skip to content

Queen, Daniel Stephen

CPSO#: 84613

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Everett Chalmers Hospital PO Box 9000 700 Priestman Street Fredericton, NB E3B 5N5
Date Received: 05 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL STEPHEN QUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 16 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2007 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2019