skip to content

Quan, Jessica Wai-Chuen

CPSO#: 95189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Canada
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 6060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Quan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Quan ( CPSO# 95189 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA WAI-CHUEN QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014