Quadros, Kenneth (CPSO#: 97643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH QUADROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUADROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2016 to 23 Oct 2016
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2018