Qu, Xuan Lu Melody (CPSO#: 98722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: Qu, Xuan Lu (used until: 14 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8650
Fax: (519) 685-8627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Qu ( CPSO# 98722 )

Business Address:
LHSC London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8650

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XUAN LU MELODY QU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2018