skip to content

Qaisy, Yehia Saad

CPSO#: 96708

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
170 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: 905-275-3912
Fax: 905-275-3918 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 4
60 Bristol Road East
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 501-0035
Fax: (905) 501-0039
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yehia Qaisy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 25 2016
Corporation Name: Dr. Yehia Qaisy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Qaisy ( CPSO# 96708 )

Business Address:
170 Queensway West
Suite 112
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 275-3912


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YEHIA SAAD QAISY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QAISY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2012