skip to content

Qaderi, Ashley Raj

CPSO#: 97525

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Malhotra, Ashley Raj (used until: 09 Oct 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M4Y1
Phone: 905-592-3946 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Qaderi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Qaderi ( CPSO# 97525 )

Business Address:
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 592-3946

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHLEY RAJ QADERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QADERI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 04 Jun 2012 to 22 Jun 2012
EL - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014