skip to content

Qaadri, Mussarrat Khurshid

CPSO#: 22593

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Mar 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
15 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 2K2
Phone: (416) 925-6726
Fax: (416) 925-6726 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUSSARRAT KHURSHID QAADRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QAADRI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1970