skip to content

Pysyk, Christopher Lee

CPSO#: 84800

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
1401 Critical Care Wing
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1M 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C.L. Pysyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pysyk ( CPSO# 84800 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
1401 Critical Care Wing
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1M 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER LEE PYSYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYSYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011