skip to content

Pyne, Lonnie Stuart

CPSO#: 100719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LONNIE STUART PYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2018