Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Nov 2004
Summary:
On November 8, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Pyne committed acts of professional misconduct in that:
(a) he practised while knowing that he has deficient clinical ability;
(b) he practised during the period after he was notified by the College that he has deficient clinical ability and before he was notified by the College that he no longer has deficient clinical ability; and
(c) he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful.
The Discipline Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Pyne to attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.
2. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Pyne(s certificate of registration for a period of 10 months which will include the period during which Dr. Pyne(s license was interimly suspended; the suspension will cease on November 9, 2004.
3. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Pyne(s certificate of registration:
(a) that Dr. Pyne abide by the recommendation of the Quality Assurance Committee that he cease and desist practice, unless and until that recommendation is changed, at which time he shall abide by any other recommendation made by the Quality Assurance Committee.
4. The Discipline Committee directs that Dr. Pyne pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.
5. The Discipline Committee further directs that the results of this proceeding be recorded on the public Register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 08, 2004
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jun 2002
Summary:
On June 24, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Pyne(s plea of guilt and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession . By way of accepting a joint submission on penalty, the Discipline Committee ordered that:
1) Dr. Pyne be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;
2) Dr. Pyne be referred to the Quality Assurance Committee and abide by the Committee(s recommendations and comply with any terms, limitations and conditions which that Committee may impose on his certificate of registration
3) Dr. Pyne pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00 by July 24, 2002; and,
4) Dr. Pyne will complete the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario Boundaries Course within the next 12 months.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 24, 2002