skip to content

Pylypiak, Daria Christina

CPSO#: 93169

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Infinity Health Centre
39 Lower Simcoe Street
Toronto ON  M5J 3A6
Phone: (416) 504-0628
Fax: (416) 504-2009 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Infinity Health Centre Oakville
2441 Lakeshore Rd. W
Oakville ON  L6L 5V5
Canada
Phone: 905-847-2021
Fax: 905-847-5042
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Pylypiak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pylypiak ( CPSO# 93169 )

Business Address:
Infinity Health Centre
39 Lower Simcoe Street
Toronto ON  M5J 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 504-0628

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DARIA CHRISTINA PYLYPIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYLYPIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012