skip to content

Pyle, Adam

CPSO#: 98530

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Windsor University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Emergency Department
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

47 Liberty St. S
Emergency Dept.
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: 9056233331
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

73 Regent Park Blvd., 3rd floor
Sumac Creek Health Centre
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-3022
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adam Pyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pyle ( CPSO# 98530 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
73 Regent Park Boulevard
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone Number: (416) 864-3022

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAM PYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014