Puri, Manveen Singh (CPSO#: 101010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
32 Canadian Forces Health Svcs Ctr
1 Yukon Lane
Toronto ON  M3K 0A1
Phone: (416) 633 6200 Ext. 3951
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ACT Toronto
1288 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1M6
Canada
Phone: (416) 462 0228
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Grey Bruce Health Services
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Canada
Phone: (519) 986 3040
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Deep River District Hospital
117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (613) 584 3333
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: (613) 732 2811
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manveen Puri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Puri ( CPSO# 101010)

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
117 Banting Drive
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Phone Number: (613) 584-3333

Business Address:
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Phone Number: (519) 986-3040

Business Address:
1288 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1M6
Phone Number: (416) 462-0228

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANVEEN SINGH PURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015