skip to content

Puodziukas, Liudas Edward

CPSO#: 24780

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021