skip to content

Pundyk, Katherine Jane

CPSO#: 94935

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2011 to 04 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2012 to 29 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 07 Feb 2013 to 06 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 14 Nov 2013 to 11 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016