skip to content

Pun, Cynthia

CPSO#: 86651

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkdale Queen West Community
Health Centre (Queen West site)
168 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5V 2R4
Phone: (416) 703-8480
Fax: (416) 703-8479 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

303-1466 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Pun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pun ( CPSO# 86651 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 536-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA PUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009