skip to content

Pulle, Garret Francis

CPSO#: 89377

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Avenue
Humber River Hospital
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3030 Birchmount Rd.
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Garret Pulle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Pulle ( CPSO# 89377 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GARRET FRANCIS PULLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PULLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2015