Puentes Beltran, Wilfredo (CPSO#: 98546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2016

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia & Periop Med
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Puentes Beltran & Casas Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Casas Lopez ( CPSO# 98699 )
Dr. W. Puentes Beltran ( CPSO# 98546 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
LHSC London Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3022

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Feb 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Wilfredo Puentes Beltran may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia  and  Perioperative  Medicine,  University  of  Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Puentes Beltran holds an academic appointment
                        at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or  when  Dr.  Puentes  Beltran  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Puentes Beltran's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Puentes  Beltran 's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  February 1, 2016, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Puentes  Beltran's academic appointment at the
                  University of Western Ontario, the expiry  date  can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.