skip to content

Puente, Sara Cristina

CPSO#: 86556

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Middlesex Health Centre
278 Metcalfe St W
Strathroy ON  N7G 1N3
Phone: (519) 245-3590
Fax: (519) 245-6032 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Puente Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Puente ( CPSO# 86556 )

Business Address:
31 Caradoc Street North
Strathroy ON  N7G 2M5
Phone Number: (519) 245-3590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA CRISTINA PUENTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUENTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009