skip to content

Prudhomme, Gerald Joseph

CPSO#: 33143

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Feb 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Division of Pathology
Unity Health Toronto, St. Michael's
30 Bond Street, Room 418-LKSKI
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 77601
Fax: (416) 864-5648 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GERALD JOSEPH PRUDHOMME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRUDHOMME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1999