skip to content

Provost, Viviane

CPSO#: 92312

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2013