skip to content

Proulx, Bertrand Joseph John

CPSO#: 22234

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Nov 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Dec 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Nov 2008

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: October 21, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Bertrand Joseph John Proulx to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, DR. BERTRAND JOSEPH JOHN PROULX:
1). Hereby resign from the College, effective November 14, 2008.
3). Undertake not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
4). Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as public information.
5). Acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated November 19, 2007, for sexual abuse, disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and failing to maintain standard of practice of the profession.
6). By entering into this undertaking, do not admit any of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated November 19, 2007 (the “Notice”). 7). Acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to terminate all outstanding investigations.
8). Agree that if the College should became aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice.