skip to content

Promislow, Steven Joseph

CPSO#: 97460

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
05 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Promislow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Promislow ( CPSO# 97460 )

Business Address:
40 Ruskin Street
H-S414
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7022

Medical Records Location

Address: Ottawa Heart Institute 40 Ruskin St Ottawa, ON K1Y 4W7
Date Received: 05 May 2021


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 08 May 2012 to 30 May 2012
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 2021