skip to content

Prola, Ivo Roberto Dorneles

CPSO#: 94387

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade de Santa Maria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 18 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 19 Nov 2010 to 25 Aug 2011
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013