skip to content

Pritzker, Kenneth Phillip Henry

CPSO#: 21597

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 May 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 university Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (647) 221-6909
Fax: (416) 486-9460 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

139 Glencairn Avenue
Toronto ON  M4R 1N1
Canada
Phone: (647) 221-6909
Fax: (416) 486-9460
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:16 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENNETH PHILLIP HENRY PRITZKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRITZKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1972