skip to content

Pritchard, Sandy James

CPSO#: 30368

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 Aug 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sandy James Pritchard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pritchard ( CPSO# 30368 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
66 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Phone Number: (416) 922-4513

Business Address:
22 Bennington Heights Dr
East York ON  M4G 1A6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Aug 2021