skip to content

Pringle, Peter Speirs

CPSO#: 24860

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jan 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS
Instructions: Tel:1-888-563-3732 Fax: 1-877-398-5932 www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 18 Aug 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2021