skip to content

Prince, William Ross

CPSO#: 17798

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Apr 2022
EXPIRY DATE
28 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

162 Dianne Ave, Oakville,ON,,L6J H1
Date Received: 28 Apr 2022


Instructions/Address:

Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should send a written request to: 162 Dianne Ave, Oakville, ON, L6J 4H1; Fax: 905 845 3272
Date Received: 18 Nov 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 2022