skip to content

Prince, Douglas Arthur

CPSO#: 18706

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 11-May-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Douglas Prince Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: ODS PO Box 2071 Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8 Tel: 1-877-560-4637 or 705-560-8461 Fax: 705-524-8012 Email: [email protected] Website: www.odstorage.com
Date Received: 02 Feb 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 2012