skip to content

Primiani, Nadia Sarah

CPSO#: 94379

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 May 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Primiani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Primiani ( CPSO# 94379 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADIA SARAH PRIMIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIMIANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2014