skip to content

Pridham, Cheryl Jennifer

CPSO#: 90599

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: MacAulay, Cheryl Jennifer (used until: 24 Nov 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Hamilton Street
Elora ON
PO Box 3000
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-5345
Fax: (519) 846-8544 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cheryl Pridham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pridham ( CPSO# 90599 )

Business Address:
21 Hamilton Street
P O Box 3000
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-5345

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERYL JENNIFER PRIDHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIDHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011