skip to content

Price, Peter Gordon

CPSO#: 19680

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1994