skip to content

Pretorius, Marina

CPSO#: 85688

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 14
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone: (705) 324-2420
Fax: (705) 324-1950 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Pretorius Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pretorius ( CPSO# 85688 )

Business Address:
Suite 14
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone Number: (705) 324-2420

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6191

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARINA PRETORIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRETORIUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective June 7, 2019, Dr. Pretorius has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)