skip to content

Preston, Helen Ann

CPSO#: 16833

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Feb 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Feb 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1958

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775 0093 or [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1956
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2021