skip to content

Pressnail, Bryn Lloyd

CPSO#: 30836

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Feb 2022
EXPIRY DATE
18 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Supervised Short Duration Practice as of 19 Jan 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bryn Pressnail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: 5 Bay St Oro-Medonte, Ontario L0L 2L0
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jan 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Feb 2022