skip to content

Pressnail, Bryn Lloyd

CPSO#: 30836

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
29 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Supervised Short Duration Practice as of 01 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bryn Pressnail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: 5 Bay St Oro-Medonte, Ontario L0L 2L0
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRYN LLOYD PRESSNAIL may practise medicine only to the extent required by the appointment at UNDEFINDED YET for which the certificate is issued to Dr. PRESSNAIL;

(2) Dr. PRESSNAIL may practise medicine only under the supervision of the member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario who has given an undertaking to supervise Dr. PRESSNAIL and be responsible for providing continuing care for the patients attended by Dr. PRESSNAIL;

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following days:

(i) The day of expiry of the appointment referred to in clause (1),

(ii) The day Dr. PRESSNAIL leaves Ontario, or

(iii) The thirtieth day after the certificate is issued.

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 29 Jun 2021.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Jun 2021