skip to content

Premji, Laila

CPSO#: 90911

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Nurmohamed, Laila (used until: 10 Jan 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 224698 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAILA PREMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREMJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014